FL S1870 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain individuals involved in the management of behavioral health managing entities, community-based care lead agencies, and aging resource centers, respectively, are subject to part III of ch. 112, F.S.; prohibiting such individuals from voting on any measure that may inure to their private gain or loss or to private gain or loss of other specified entities or persons; prohibiting such individuals from accepting gifts or expenditures from a person or entity that is under consideration for a contract or from certain individuals who have contractual relationships with the managing entity, lead agency, or aging resource center; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Privatized Governmental Functions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 2053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1870 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1870/BillText/Filed/HTML |