FL S1868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring applicants seeking to obtain or renew a license in the state hemp program to submit with each application a fee to be specified by rule of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; limiting the amount of the fee; requiring fee proceeds to be deposited in a specified trust fund for the administration of the state hemp program, etc.
Title
Fees/State Hemp Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1133 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1868 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1868/BillText/Filed/HTML |