FL S1866 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for reclassification of assault or battery offenses committed upon certain persons while they are engaged in the lawful performance of their duties, etc.
Title
Assault or Battery
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1866 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1866/BillText/Filed/HTML |