FL S1864 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2021-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2021-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to maintain a disqualification list of certain persons; providing that certain provisions relating to conduct and prohibition from employment apply to educational support employees; prohibiting certain employees and personnel from employment under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain individuals from employment at a charter school; revising acts that warrant a disciplinary action by the Education Practices Commission, etc.
Title
Educator Conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2021-138) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 131 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/30/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H131 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-138
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 796 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 797 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |