FL S1862 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to establish fees for issuance or renewal of specialty license plates marketed and sold by private vendors; requiring certain portions of a contract with the private vendor to be paid with such fees; requiring certain excess fees to be deposited in the General Revenue Fund, etc.
Title
Fees/Specialty License Plates Marketed and Sold by Private Vendors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1269 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H1267 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1930 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
H1267 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S1930 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1862 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1862/BillText/Filed/HTML |