FL S1862 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying requirements for certain agencies in the disposition of expunged criminal history records; providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain expunged criminal history records and related information of persons who possessed 4 ounces or less of cannabis, with exceptions; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Criminal History Records and Related Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1860 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1389 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback