FL S1860 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the sales tax exemption for the sale of marijuana and marijuana delivery devices to only include sales to qualified patients or caregivers; revising provisions related to the licensure and functions of medical marijuana treatment centers (MMTCs); specifying application requirements for MMTCs to obtain cultivation licenses and processing licenses; authorizing MMTCs licensed to cultivate or process marijuana to use contractors to assist with the cultivation and processing of marijuana under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Availability of Marijuana for Adult Use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1862 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H149 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H1389 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381990Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback