FL S1858 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing chapter 73-370, Laws of Florida, relating to the designation of a Florida State University facility; rescinding the designation of B.K. Roberts Hall at Florida State University, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

B.K. Roberts Hall at Florida State University

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14SenateDied in Education
2022-03-12SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback