FL S1858 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that a financing agreement may not be used to fund ancillary work except under certain conditions; specifying how the fair market value on the property on which a qualifying improvement will be placed is derived and requiring such value to be disclosed to the property owner before execution of a financing agreement; specifying situations in which a contract to sell or install a qualifying improvement on a residential property is unenforceable, etc.
Title
Improvements to Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1225 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1858 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1858/BillText/Filed/HTML |