FL S1858 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9089 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9089 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 18, 2013, as "University of Miami Men's Hurricanes Basketball Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
University of Miami Men's Hurricanes Basketball Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9089 (Adopted) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H9089 (Similar To) 2013-04-17 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1858 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1858 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1858/BillText/Filed/HTML |