FL S1858 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1389 -SJ 1668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1389 -SJ 1668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a specified determination as a condition of an agreement for water storage and water quality improvements on private agricultural lands; providing a methodology for such determination; providing for regulation of such lands for the duration of the agreement and after its expiration, etc.
Title
Water Storage and Water Quality Improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1389 -SJ 1668 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1668 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 902 | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 902 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 519 | |
2012-02-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 499 | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 499 | |
2012-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/13/12, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Agriculture -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time -SJ 308 | |
2012-01-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-30 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/30/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 241 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 241 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |