FL S1852 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to submit a report of its recommendations to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electromagnetic Pulse Preparedness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Regulated Industries; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback