FL S1846 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring health insurers and pharmacy benefit managers to establish an online electronic prior authorization process by a certain date; requiring all prior authorization requests to health insurers and pharmacy benefit managers to be made using such online electronic prior authorization process by a certain date; deleting provisions requiring prior authorization forms to be approved by the Financial Services Commission under certain circumstances; specifying requirements for, and restrictions on, health insurers and pharmacy benefit managers relating to prior authorization information, requirements, restrictions, and changes; prohibiting health insurers and health maintenance organizations, respectively, from imposing an additional prior authorization requirement with respect to certain surgical or invasive procedures or certain items, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Prior Authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1439 (Similar To) 2021-03-05 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S528 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62742392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6413156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback