FL S1844 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Amendment(s) adopted (912852, 295630, 180196) -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00933; Laid on Table -SJ 00933
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Amendment(s) adopted (912852, 295630, 180196) -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00933; Laid on Table -SJ 00933
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each agency, before adopting, amending, or repealing certain rules, to prepare a statement of estimated regulatory costs of the proposed rule if the proposed rule has an adverse effect on small business or increases regulatory costs in excess of a specified amount. Prohibits a rule from taking effect until it is ratified by the Legislature, etc.
Title
Rulemaking [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00932; Amendment(s) adopted (912852, 295630, 180196) -SJ 00932; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1565 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00933; Laid on Table -SJ 00933 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-23 | Original reference(s) removed: Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00797 | |
2010-04-22 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-20 | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00751; CS read 1st time on 04/22/10 -SJ 00751 | |
2010-04-16 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00645; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/20/10, 10:30 am, 110-S | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00564 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00125 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1537 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
H1565 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H1565 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0120 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |