FL S1842 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the DOT to notify certain property owners and local governmental entities of certain proposed projects before finalizing the design of certain transportation projects. Provides a timeframe for notification. Requires the department to hold a public hearing and receive public input regarding the effects of the project on local business, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Projects [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1056 - Passage (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0023 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
2010-06-04 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01225; CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 01225
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01170; Substituted for CS/HB 1331 -HJ 01170
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -HJ 01109; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01109
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -SJ 00814; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00814
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00785
2010-04-19 Favorable by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651
2010-04-16 Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00600; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 309-C
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-14 CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00608
2010-04-12 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00524; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K
2010-04-08 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-07 CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00543
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00125
2010-02-17 Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2010-02-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1331 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1842 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01170
S0482 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0335199Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1842&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1842.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1842c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1842c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1842er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB18420426100023.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB18420428101056.html

Bill Comments

feedback