FL S1834 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the penalties for persons operating a vessel involved in an accident or injury who leave the scene of the accident or injury under certain circumstances; providing graduated penalties depending on the level of damage to property or person; providing a mandatory minimum sentence for a person who willfully commits such violation resulting in the death of another while boating under the influence; providing that a person commits boating under the influence manslaughter when their impaired operation of a vessel causes the death of an unborn child; revising the definition of the term "vessel homicide" to include the killing of an unborn child by causing injury to the mother by operation of a vessel in a reckless manner under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vessel Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Environment and Natural Resources
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Criminal Justice; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1275 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
782072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback