FL S1824 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a deed restriction, covenant, declaration, or other binding agreement from prohibiting or having the effect of prohibiting the installation of cool roofs or renewable energy source devices; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, in coordination with the Department of Management Services and the Department of Environmental Protection, to develop a greenhouse gas registry and inventory; establishing the Clean Energy Research, Development, Demonstration, and Deployment Center Program within the department for a specified purpose, etc.
Title
Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1351 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1824 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1824/BillText/Filed/HTML |