FL S1824 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to release certain digital images to the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to identify certain persons. Authorizes the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to grant waivers of renewal fees under certain circumstances. Revises continuing education requirements for certain license reactivations. Repeals provisions relating to Uniform Standards of Professional Appraisal Practice, etc.
Title
Regulated Professions and Occupations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-03 | In Messages | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time -SJ 725 | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 640 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-25 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 18 NAYS 2 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-07 | Now in Budget -SJ 408 | |
2011-04-06 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-05 | CS/CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 408 | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 309 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Transportation; Budget -SJ 208 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
473 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
473 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
686 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |