FL S1820 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Health Care Ethics and Liberty Protection Act"; providing that health care providers and health care payors have the right not to participate in or pay for any health care services that violate their consciences; providing that providers and payors have a right to make certain decisions consistent with their religious beliefs under certain circumstances; prohibiting a person from taking or threatening to take adverse action against such providers and payors for specified actions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protections of Medical Conscience

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H747 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38100321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback