FL S1812 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to remove marijuana from the Schedule I drug list and allow it to be researched and used for medical purposes, etc.
Title
Remove Marijuana from the Schedule I Drug List
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1453 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1812 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1812/BillText/Filed/HTML |