FL S1802 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the Department of Business and Professional Regulation is responsible for the licensure and regulation of preview games or machines; prohibiting operators from operating a preview game or machine not leased from a licensed lessor, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preview Games and Machines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1293 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback