FL S1800 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain vendors from specified delivery restrictions under certain circumstances; providing applicability; authorizing vendors licensed as manufacturers under ch. 561, F.S., to transfer malt beverages to certain restaurants with common ownership affiliations; providing that certain manufacturers may transport malt beverages in vehicles owned or leased by certain persons other than the manufacturers, etc.
Title
Malt Beverage Manufacturers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1792 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1389 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1443 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1389 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1443 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1800 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1800/BillText/Filed/HTML |