FL S1796 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the court to prioritize certain forms of alimony; authorizing the court to grant permanent alimony only if both parties enter into such agreement; revising factors that the court must consider in determining the proper type and amount of alimony; prohibiting an award of rehabilitative alimony from exceeding specified timeframes; requiring the court to consider specified factors when determining an alimony award involving the existence of a supportive relationship between the obligee and another person; authorizing the court to order an obligee to reimburse alimony payments to the obligor under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolution of Marriage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2022-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1395 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6119Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback