FL S1796 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying and location information of commissioners and commission investigators of the Florida Commission on Offender Review and the names and personal identifying and location information of the spouses and children of such personnel; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying and location information of school administrators and the names and personal identifying and location information of the spouses and children of the school administrators; providing statements of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Commissioners and Commission Investigators/School Administrators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback