FL S1796 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a paramedic or an emergency medical technician to provide alternative treatment options to certain patients in a nonemergency setting; revising requirements for rules adopted by the Department of Health governing minimum standards for ambulance equipment and supplies and ambulance and vehicle design and construction; providing immunity from liability for certain individuals who provide emergency examination and treatment of an incapacitated patient under the supervision of specified medical professionals, etc.
Title
Emergency Medical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1295 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1796 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1796/BillText/Filed/HTML |