FL S1796 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a preferred worker program for permanently impaired workers who are unable to return to work, etc.
Title
Preferred Worker Program
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-02-08 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-02-08 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 349 | |
2012-02-07 | Now in Budget -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 234 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 234 | |
2012-01-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1796 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1796/BillText/Filed/HTML |