FL S1794 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "clinic" to exempt certain groups of individuals providing applied behavior analysis services from health care clinic licensure requirements; revising the definition of the term "private instructional personnel" to include certain registered behavior technicians, etc.
Title
Applied Behavior Analysis Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1401 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1794 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1794/BillText/Filed/HTML |