FL S1788 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing consumers to bring civil actions against telephone solicitors; providing that substance abuse marketing service providers are subject to the Florida Telemarketing Act; revising provisions for claims of exemption from the Florida Telemarketing Act; requiring separate registrations for each business, trade, or fictitious name used by a mover or moving broker; authorizing movers to act as moving brokers without a separate registration under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1267 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 6055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
527 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |