FL S1786 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Auditor General to audit the Florida Birth-Related Neurological Injury Compensation Association at least once every 3 years; revising requirements for the award for compensation for claims under the plan; increasing the amount that may be awarded to the parents or legal guardians of an infant found to have sustained a birth-related neurological injury; requiring association employees to annually sign and submit a conflict-of-interest statement as a condition of employment, etc.
Title
Florida Birth-Related Neurological Injury Compensation Plan
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#426 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#358 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#358 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-134 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 126068 Concur |
2021-04-29 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-29 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 902 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (401309) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (126068) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2021-04-28 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 2 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Amendment 401309 adopted |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Amendment 401309 filed |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (439190) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/16/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1165 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1786 (Ch. 2021-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |