FL S1786 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the order in which the tax credit for businesses employing and providing certain support to employees who serve as family caregivers is applied against the corporate income tax or the franchise tax; providing a tax credit for certain qualified businesses employing and providing mental health support to employees who serve as family caregivers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Caregiver Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220197Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback