FL S1784 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Statewide Council on Human Trafficking to recommend specified identifiers or a screening tool by a specified date to assist emergency room health care personnel in recognizing victims of human trafficking; requiring the Department of Health to post the screening tool and certain information provided by the council on its website, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16617Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback