FL S1782 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a law enforcement agency to contract with a private entity to send a licensed, state-authorized claims adjuster to complete a short-form crash report or provide a driver exchange-of-information form, in lieu of having a law enforcement officer investigate the crash; requiring the claims adjuster to submit the short-form crash report or driver exchange-of-information form to the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles and the law enforcement agency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Accidents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1307 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback