FL S1776 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Management Services to develop geographic information system maps in collaboration with specified entities and consistent with certain federal reporting standards by a specified date; specifying required contents of the maps; requiring the department to annually update such maps and establish a mechanism to receive and verify public input related to broadband Internet service, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Internet Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1309 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
H969 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
S1166 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3640135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback