FL S1774 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the person or entity preparing the financial report for an association to rely on a specified inspection report; requiring an association to provide a board candidate's certification form to unit owners for specified purposes; requiring a board to have certain condominium buildings inspected every 5 years by an architect or engineer, etc.
Title
Condominium Associations
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1397 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1774 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1774/BillText/Filed/HTML |