FL S1772 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding specified coverage level options required in reimbursement contracts between the State Board of Administration and insurers writing policies in this state; deleting the actual costs paid due to applying the cash build-up factor as a basis for certain separate rate filings under certain circumstances by residential property insurers; deleting a provision authorizing Citizens Property Insurance Corporation to implement rate increases to reflect the effect of the cash build-up factor, etc.
Title
Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1746 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1746 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1772 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1772/BillText/Filed/HTML |