FL S1764 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum and maximum health insurance subsidies. Provides for a cost-of-living adjustment to the subsidy. Increases the contribution paid by employers of members in state-administered retirement plans. Provides legislative findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retiree Health Insurance Subsidy [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Community Affairs
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Education Pre-K - 12; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00121
2010-02-10 Referred to Community Affairs; Education Pre-K - 12; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-05 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0112363Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback