FL S1762 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a school health services plan to provide for the training of secondary school health nurses to help them identify and respond appropriately to students who are victims of rape, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Training for Secondary School Nurses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback