FL S1754 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Parent-Teacher Compact Act"; requiring the State Board of Education to establish the Parent-Teacher Compact program; authorizing a parent to enter into a written compact with a teacher to oversee the education of his or her children; requiring a teacher to submit a compact to the Department of Education for review and approval; requiring a teacher who is serving students under a compact to maintain a portfolio of student records and materials, etc.
Title
Parent-Teacher Compact Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1583 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1754 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1754/BillText/Filed/HTML |