FL S1748 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the DEP, in coordination with the water management districts, to develop a statewide stormwater quality treatment rule by a certain date. Provides legislative intent and definitions. Provides rule requirements. Exempts agency action taken pursuant to the rule from the dispute-resolution procedures of ch. 70, F.S. Specifies the relationship of the rule to rules already adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stormwater Management Systems [EPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00120
2010-02-10 Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations
2010-02-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7171 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in General Government Policy Council
S0550 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-205; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
03734131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback