FL S1744 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the types of black business enterprises eligible to receive funds under the program; requiring that the application process and the annual certification process for the program be separate and distinct processes; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to consider certain factors when assessing applications; requiring that applications contain certain information; revising eligibility requirements for recipients under the program, etc.
Title
Black Business Loan Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 7094 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 7102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1744 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1744/BillText/Filed/HTML |