FL S1738 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 977
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain motor vehicle dealers and their leasing or rental affiliates are immune from causes of action and are not liable for harm to persons or property under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Dealers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 977
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 977
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateRemaining references corrected to Judiciary; Rules
2020-02-13SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Banking and Insurance
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H977 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-108

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback