FL S1736 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring public schools to create a School Staff Assistance for Emergencies (SAFE) Team and a school elopement plan; requiring the team to create student-specific elopement quick reference guides for certain students; requiring public schools to annually submit their plans to the district school board, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Elopement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H183 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003211Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback