FL S1736 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/06/11
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions relating to the Drug-Free Workplace Act. Deletes a provision that requires a laboratory to submit to the AHCA a monthly report containing statistical information regarding the testing of employees and job applicants. Deletes a requirement that facilities licensed under part I of ch. 395, F.S., pay licensing fees at the time of inspection. Provides that a nurse registry is exempt from certain license penalties and fines otherwise imposed by the AHCA on a nurse registry under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/06/11
2011-05-03 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 778
2011-04-21 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-20 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-03-24 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-22 CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 286
2011-03-17 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-10 Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 197
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38106014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944787Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39510972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3952050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000239Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4001183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400148Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400179Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400484Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4088065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40991196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42954Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627645Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627668Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627669Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback