FL S1736 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for retroactive application. Establishes temporary state extended benefits for weeks of unemployment. Provides for state extended benefits for certain weeks and for periods of high unemployment. Specifies the duration of liens securing the payment of unemployment compensation tax obligations. Provides for the treatment of a single-member limited liability company as the employer for purposes of unemployment compensation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment Compensation [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1072 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1071 - (Y: 43 N: 68 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0006 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-17 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-90; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138)
2010-05-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01247; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 01247; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2 -HJ 01253
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01133
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -HJ 01107; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01108
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -SJ 00807; CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00808
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00672; Amendment(s) adopted (875252) -SJ 00672; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00673
2010-04-19 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00636
2010-04-16 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-15 CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00636; CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -SJ 00639
2010-04-12 Original reference(s) removed: Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00574; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/15/10, 2:00 pm, 412-K
2010-04-09 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-07 CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00563
2010-04-02 On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Commerce; Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00119
2010-02-10 Referred to Commerce; Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1447 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H5003 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00016; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7033 (Similar To) 2010-03-08 - Chapter No. 2010-1; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H7157 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-138; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
S1976 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Amendment(s) adopted (925538, 849614, 815508, 587724, 342988) -SJ 00996; Substituted CS/HB 7157 -SJ 00996; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 109 (Ch. 2010-32), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00996
S2294 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H7061 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
S1666 (Similar To) 2010-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Commerce; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00115; On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 02/16/10, 1:30 pm, 401-S; CS by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00159; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00164; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 02/17/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K; CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00159; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00165; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00005; Substituted CS/HB 7033 -SJ 00006; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7033 (Ch. 2010-1), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90) -SJ 00006

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0055204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0095091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
021325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04431117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04431215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0443163Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04431715Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1736&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1736.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1736c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1736c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1736e1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1736er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB17360426100006.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB17360428101071.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB17360428101072.html

Bill Comments

feedback