FL S1734 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback