FL S1732 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the OPPAGA to conduct a study to evaluate the effectiveness and cost efficiency of having a full-time Legislature versus a part-time Legislature. Requires that OPPAGA submit a report to the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives by a specified date.
Title
Prog. Policy Analysis & Govt. Accountability Off. [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00119 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0863 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)