FL S1728 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting obsolete provisions related to eligibility thresholds for personal lines residential coverage with the Citizens Property Insurance Corporation; providing for a required limited annual rate increase for specified polices; providing that eligible surplus lines insurers may participate, in the same manner and on the same terms as an authorized insurer, in depopulation, take-out, or keep-out programs relating to policies removed from Citizens Property Insurance Corporation; revising a prohibition against the issuance of insurance policies containing certain deductible provisions; authorizing insurers to limit roof claim payments to the actual cash value under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Property Insurance
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Jim Boyd [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 11 587 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (327802) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (186652, 385312) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1307 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S186 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S186 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
489 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |