FL S1724 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the definition of the term "harm" to include the infliction of certain mental injury on a child; revising a provision relating to mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse, abandonment, or neglect to include child psychological abuse; requiring the Board of Psychology within the Department of Health to revise the continuing education requirements for renewal of a license to practice psychology to include child psychological abuse, etc.
Title
Child Psychological Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1399 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1724 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1724/BillText/Filed/HTML |