FL S1722 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for certification and training; revising provisions regarding approval of foods safety training programs and responsibilities of public food service establishments to include all employees; requiring operators of public food service establishments to display a menu listing common allergens in food and drinks; authorizing the division to fine, suspend, or revoke the license of a public food service establishment under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Food Service Establishments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced
2023-03-09SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-03-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H865 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509049Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback