FL S1722 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Jobs Retention Act of 2021"; requiring certain employers that intend to relocate out of state or cease operation to notify the Department of Business and Professional Regulation within a specified timeframe; requiring the department to compile and publish a semiannual list of employers that relocate out of state or cease operation; providing that such employers are ineligible for state grants, loans, or tax benefits for a specified timeframe; requiring the head of each state agency to ensure that certain services are performed by state contractors within the state, etc.
Title
Workforce Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1571 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1722 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1722/BillText/Filed/HTML |